NJ S2311 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits business receiving State development subsidies from making certain campaign contributions.
Title
Prohibits business receiving State development subsidies from making certain campaign contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-11) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3874 (Same As) 2014-10-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee