NJ S2203 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits escrow agent evaluation services from charging escrow agents fees.
Title
Prohibits escrow agent evaluation services from charging escrow agents fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A308 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A308 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.196.