NJ S2082 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

The "Opioid Antidote and Overdose Prevention Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The "Opioid Antidote and Overdose Prevention Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - Assembly Add to Calendar (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate Suspend Rule 23:4 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate Suspend Rule 17:2 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly Emergency Resolution Vote (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly Substitute For A3095 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateApproved P.L.2013, c.46.
2013-04-29SenatePassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-2-6)
2013-04-29SenateMotion To Suspend Rule 22:5(Voice)(Benson)
2013-04-29SenateMotion To Suspend Rule15:11(Voice)(Benson)
2013-04-29SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2013-04-29AssemblyPassed by the Senate (24-2)
2013-04-29AssemblyMotion To Suspend Rule 23:4 (24-1)(Vitale)
2013-04-29Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (24-1)
2013-04-29AssemblyMotion To Suspend Rule 17:2 (21-0)(Vitale)
2013-04-29AssemblyConditional Veto, Received, 1st Reading to Concur with Gov.
2013-03-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-6-0)
2013-03-21AssemblySubstituted for A3095 (1R)
2013-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2013-02-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2013-01-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-06-18SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3095 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S2082 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback