NJ S2065 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-23 - Substituted by A2717 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-23 - Substituted by A2717 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires one-time application for requesting services for individuals with developmental disabilities from DCF and DHS.
Title
Requires one-time application for requesting services for individuals with developmental disabilities from DCF and DHS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | Senate | Substituted by A2717 (1R) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Rescind Action of REF SBA 9/15/2014 |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2717 (Same As) 2014-12-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.78.