NJ S1993 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A2714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires continuing education for licensed practicing psychologists.
Title
Requires continuing education for licensed practicing psychologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2714 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2714 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.131.