NJ S1860 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-06-19 - Passed by the Senate (21-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of voting members of the board of governors of Rutgers University from 15 to19 members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of voting members of the board of governors of Rutgers University from 15 to19 members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-19 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (21-15)
2014-06-12SenateSenate Amendment (22-0) (Sweeney)
2014-06-02SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-03-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3046 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback