NJ S1859 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Substituted by A1153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Substituted by A1153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that electronic funds transfers are included within the scope of the statute concerning issuing or passing bad checks.
Title
Clarifies that electronic funds transfers are included within the scope of the statute concerning issuing or passing bad checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Substituted by A1153 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1153 (Same As) 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.45.