NJ S1856 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to post on its website information about inspection reports for residential health care facilities, boarding homes, and emergency shelters for the homeless, and requires notifications to DHS and counties.*
Title
Requires DCA to post on its website information about inspection reports for residential health care facilities, boarding homes, and emergency shelters for the homeless, and requires notifications to DHS and counties.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3175 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3175 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3175 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3175 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.6. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A3175 (1R) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3175 (Same As) 2014-12-15 - Substituted by S1856 (1R)