NJ S177 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides sales and use tax exemption for compressed natural gas used to fuel certain bus operation.
Title
Provides sales and use tax exemption for compressed natural gas used to fuel certain bus operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3050 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee