NJ S1382 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-29 - Approved P.L.2015, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-29 - Approved P.L.2015, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits unsolicited telemarketing sales calls to commercial mobile service devices.
Title
Prohibits unsolicited telemarketing sales calls to commercial mobile service devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Barnes [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2933 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2933 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2933 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.2. |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A2933 |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2933 (Same As) 2014-12-15 - Substituted by S1382