NJ S1365 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1678 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1678 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes court to order submission of DNA evidence to national database to determine whether the evidence matches a known individual or a DNA profile from an unsolved crime.*
Title
Authorizes court to order submission of DNA evidence to national database to determine whether the evidence matches a known individual or a DNA profile from an unsolved crime.*
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A1678 (AS) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate Substitution (28-0) (Weinberg) |
2014-10-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1678 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.127.