NJ AJR56 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR68
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR66
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR66
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-13 - Transferred to Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-13 - Transferred to Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates school week immediately following second Sunday in May, Mother's Day, each year as "School Garden week."*
Title
Designates school week immediately following second Sunday in May, Mother's Day, each year as "School Garden week."*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Alison McHose [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR56 (Carry Over) 2015-01-13 - Transferred to Senate Education Committee
AJR56 (Carry Over) 2015-01-13 - Transferred to Senate Education Committee
SJR49 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
AJR56 (Carry Over) 2015-01-13 - Transferred to Senate Education Committee
SJR49 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee