NJ ACR186 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR123
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to increase mandatory retirement age for judges from 70 to 75.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to increase mandatory retirement age for judges from 70 to 75.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR186 (Carry Over) 2014-09-29 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
SCR148 (Same As) 2015-01-30 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to enact
SCR148 (Same As) 2015-01-30 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to enact
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/ACR186 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/ACR/186_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR186 |