NJ ACR159 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates suffering endured by comfort women during forced internment in Japanese military camps.
Title
Commemorates suffering endured by comfort women during forced internment in Japanese military camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for SCR124 (2R) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR124 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Substituted by ACR159 (1R)