NJ A4888 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2484
Note: Carry Foward to future S1958
Note: Carry Foward to future S1958
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates fee for filing certified copy of name change order.
Title
Eliminates fee for filing certified copy of name change order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-5-0) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4888 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4888 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3332 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4888 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3332 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee