NJ A668 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide to prospective students certain cost, loan, and debt information in financial aid shopping sheet.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide to prospective students certain cost, loan, and debt information in financial aid shopping sheet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |