NJ A444 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved P.L.2011, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Disqualifies member of board of education or member of charter school board of trustees for conviction of certain crimes and requires member to undergo criminal history background investigation. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disqualifies member of board of education or member of charter school board of trustees for conviction of certain crimes and requires member to undergo criminal history background investigation. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-23 - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved P.L.2011, c.72.
2011-05-23 Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2011-05-12 Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2011-05-09 Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2011-05-05 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2011-05-05 Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend.
2011-02-17 Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-1)
2011-01-06 Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2010-12-20 Passed by the Senate (36-0)
2010-12-20 Emergency Resolution (36-0) (Allen)
2010-12-20 Senate Amendment (34-0) (Allen)
2010-12-20 Substituted for S295
2010-10-14 Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2010-06-21 Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2010-06-21 Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0)
2010-06-10 Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2010-01-12 Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S295 (Same As) 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A444 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback