NJ A4172 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2013 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.
Title
Makes FY 2013 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2825 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2825 (Same As) 2013-07-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4172 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4172_I1.HTM |