NJ A3846 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2792
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes third degree crime for certain trespasses involving victim of domestic violence.
Title
Establishes third degree crime for certain trespasses involving victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Samuel Fiocchi [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3846 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee