NJ A3818 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the "Uniform Electronic Transactions Act" applies to real estate transactions.
Title
Clarifies that the "Uniform Electronic Transactions Act" applies to real estate transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Linda Stender [D] |
Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2242 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2242 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.132. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2242 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-1-0) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2242 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A3818