NJ A3806 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A315
Note: Carry Foward to future S2679
Note: Carry Foward to future S2679
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Title
Establishes four-year pilot program in Ocean County for electronic monitoring of certain domestic violence offenders; designated as "Lisa's Law"; appropriates $2.5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2493 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2493 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S2493 (2R) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3806 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3806 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2493 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3806 (2R)
A3806 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2493 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3806 (2R)