NJ A3659 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on September 9 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises definition of destructive device to include weapons of 50 caliber or greater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises definition of destructive device to include weapons of 50 caliber or greater.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-24 - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate Substitute For S2178 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate Amend (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
2013-06-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-33-3)
2013-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2013-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (23-16)
2013-05-30SenateSubstituted for S2178 (3R)
2013-05-13SenateSenate Amendment (21-0) (Lesniak)
2013-05-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2013-05-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-02-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2013-02-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (46-29-0)
2013-02-14AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Barnes)
2013-02-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2178 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3659 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback