NJ A3465 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands exceptions to minimum age requirement for operating a boat to include nontidal waters.
Title
Expands exceptions to minimum age requirement for operating a boat to include nontidal waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2257 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2257 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2257 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2257 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.67. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2257 (1R) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2257 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3465 (1R)