NJ A3410 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act."
Title
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2177 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2177 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2177 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.60. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-10) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2177 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-28-2) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2177 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A3410