NJ A3340 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1988
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional State school aid to county vocational school districts in which enrollment increases by more than 10%.
Title
Provides additional State school aid to county vocational school districts in which enrollment increases by more than 10%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2229 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2229 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2229 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-9) |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Substituted for S2229 (1R) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-14-3) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3340 (Carry Over) 2014-12-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2229 (Same As) 2014-10-23 - Substituted by A3340 (1R)
S2229 (Same As) 2014-10-23 - Substituted by A3340 (1R)