NJ A3339 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Approved P.L.2014, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Approved P.L.2014, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if a career and technical education program of a school district is taught in an industry setting, off-site location will be exempt from certain State regulations.*
Title
Provides that if a career and technical education program of a school district is taught in an industry setting, off-site location will be exempt from certain State regulations.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-14 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2227 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.75. |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Substituted for S2227 (1R) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2227 (Same As) 2014-10-14 - Substituted by A3339 (1R)