NJ A3271 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Approved P.L.2014, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Approved P.L.2014, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases and modernizes solvency requirements for certain insurers and authority of DOBI Commissioner to regulate insurer solvency.
Title
Increases and modernizes solvency requirements for certain insurers and authority of DOBI Commissioner to regulate insurer solvency.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2579 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2579 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2579 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.81. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2579 |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2579 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A3271 (1R)