NJ A3216 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Approved P.L.2015, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Approved P.L.2015, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain zero emission vehicle manufacturers to directly sell motor vehicles to consumers and requires them to operate service facilities.
Title
Permits certain zero emission vehicle manufacturers to directly sell motor vehicles to consumers and requires them to operate service facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2098 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2098 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2098 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.24. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-2) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2098 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2098 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3216