NJ A3152 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2079 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2079 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that school districts must ensure that students with disabilities have opportunities to participate in athletic activities equal to those of other students.
Title
Provides that school districts must ensure that students with disabilities have opportunities to participate in athletic activities equal to those of other students.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2079 (1R) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2079 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - Approved P.L.2014, c.10.