NJ A3037 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S736
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S736 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S736 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crimes of dog fighting and leader of a dog fighting network, and updates crime of animal fighting; amends RICO concerning dog fighting.**
Title
Establishes crimes of dog fighting and leader of a dog fighting network, and updates crime of animal fighting; amends RICO concerning dog fighting.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S736 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Andrzejczak) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1354 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S736 (Replaced by) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.85.
S736 (Replaced by) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.85.