NJ A2934 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the incorporation of psychologists.
Title
Permits the incorporation of psychologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2002 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2002 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2002 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.79. |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Substituted for S2002 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2002 (Same As) 2014-10-23 - Substituted by A2934