NJ A2802 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2752
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to establish a communication and incentive plan to encourage re-enrollment in college; requires Statewide reverse transfer agreement.
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to establish a communication and incentive plan to encourage re-enrollment in college; requires Statewide reverse transfer agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-1-0) |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2802 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee