NJ A2795 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Title
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1203 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1203 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1203 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-7) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S1203 |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-29-0) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1203 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795