NJ A2619 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Approved P.L.2015, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Approved P.L.2015, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Title
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.61. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-1) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-14) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Substituted for S1146 |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Rescind Action of REF TO SCM 6/2/14 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-8-0) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Same As) 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A2619