NJ A2477 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for pharmacists to dispense biological products.*
Title
Establishes requirements for pharmacists to dispense biological products.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1705 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1705 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1705 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1705 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.130. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1705 (SCS) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1705 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A2477 (ACS/1R)