NJ A2462 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A310
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits bad faith assertion of patent infringement.
Title
Prohibits bad faith assertion of patent infringement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2462 (Carry Over) 2014-12-18 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan)
S1563 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1563 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee