NJ A2313 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Approved P.L.2015, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Approved P.L.2015, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enables collection of voluntary contributions for New Jersey Nonprofit Veterans Organizations through gross income tax returns.*
Title
Enables collection of voluntary contributions for New Jersey Nonprofit Veterans Organizations through gross income tax returns.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.26. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substituted for S1670 |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1670 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A2313 (1R)