NJ A2276 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S87
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S172 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S172 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients from payment of municipal parking meter fees when their vehicles bear a disabled veteran's or Purple Heart license plate or placard issued by New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission.*
Title
Exempts disabled veterans and Purple Heart recipients from payment of municipal parking meter fees when their vehicles bear a disabled veteran's or Purple Heart license plate or placard issued by New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S172 (1R) |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2276 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S172 (1R)
S172 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.218.
S172 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.218.