NJ A2274 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2531
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to issue motor vehicle placard to certain veterans and waives meter fees.*
Title
Requires MVC to issue motor vehicle placard to certain veterans and waives meter fees.*
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] |
Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2274 (Carry Over) 2014-10-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride)
S3059 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3059 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee