NJ A2268 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1909
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank and Energy Bank within New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank and Energy Bank within New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S307 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S307 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S307 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-1) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S307 (1R) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-14-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2268 (Carry Over) 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S307 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2268 (1R)
S307 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2268 (1R)