NJ A2201 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.243.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certified celebrants to solemnize marriages and civil unions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certified celebrants to solemnize marriages and civil unions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-13 - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate Substitute For S2155 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2013, c.243.
2014-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-9-3)
2014-01-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2014-01-09SenatePassed by the Senate (31-6)
2014-01-09SenateSubstituted for S2155 (1R)
2013-12-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2012-03-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (66-10-0)
2012-03-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-02-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2155 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A2201 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback