NJ A2142 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved P.L.2013, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits minors under 14 years of age from using spray tanning in tanning facilities and prohibits minors under 17 years of age from using tanning beds.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits minors under 14 years of age from using spray tanning in tanning facilities and prohibits minors under 17 years of age from using tanning beds.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-14 - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate Substitute For S1172 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2013, c.39.
2013-02-14AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (57-12-7)
2013-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2013-02-07SenatePassed by the Senate (31-2)
2013-02-07SenateSubstituted for S1172 (2R)
2012-10-25SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Weinberg)
2012-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2012-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (58-7-13)
2012-05-24AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (44-32-0)
2012-05-24AssemblyMotion To Aa (McHose)
2012-05-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-01-30AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1172 (Same As) 2013-02-07 - Substituted by A2142 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback