NJ A2072 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Approved P.L.2014, c.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Approved P.L.2014, c.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school students in grades 9 through 12 to receive instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and use of an automated external defibrillator prior to graduation.*
Title
Requires public school students in grades 9 through 12 to receive instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and use of an automated external defibrillator prior to graduation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.36. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-1) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Substituted for S235 (1R) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S235 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - Substituted by A2072 (1R)