NJ A1907 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates moratorium on imposition of Statewide non-residential development fees until January 2015.
Title
Reinstates moratorium on imposition of Statewide non-residential development fees until January 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1011 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1011 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1011 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-1) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S1011 (1R) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Watson Coleman) (47-30-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Carroll) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S897 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1011 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A1907
S2629 (Same As) 2014-12-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1011 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A1907
S2629 (Same As) 2014-12-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee