NJ A1340 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A856
Note: Carry Foward to future S1498
Note: Carry Foward to future S1498
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires removal of equipment and markings on certain used emergency vehicles; requires that Attorney General issue guidelines or directives.
Title
Requires removal of equipment and markings on certain used emergency vehicles; requires that Attorney General issue guidelines or directives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1340 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1340 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1340 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee