NJ A1238 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration of certain additional securities investment advisers.
Title
Requires registration of certain additional securities investment advisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |