NJ A1162 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that electronic funds transfers are included within the scope of the civil statute concerning issuing bad checks.
Title
Clarifies that electronic funds transfers are included within the scope of the civil statute concerning issuing bad checks.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2038 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2038 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2038 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.46. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Substituted for S2038 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2038 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - Substituted by A1162