NJ A1042 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2965
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coughlin)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coughlin)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish "New Jersey Autism Website."
Title
Requires DOH to establish "New Jersey Autism Website."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coughlin) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1042 (Carry Over) 2015-02-23 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coughlin)
S1779 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1779 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee