NH SB99 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2013; Chapter 0134; Effective 06/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a study of the site evaluation committee and process, and developing regulatory criteria for the siting of energy facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a study of the site evaluation committee and process, and developing regulatory criteria for the siting of energy facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Sen. Woodburn Floor Amendment (1123s) (Y: 4 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-27SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/26/2013; Chapter 0134; Effective 06/26/2013
2013-06-12SenateEnrolled
2013-06-12HouseEnrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654
2013-06-12SenateSen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendment #1941h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1941h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1571-1572
2013-06-05HouseAmendment #1941h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1571-1572
2013-05-29HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-1941h (New Title); House Calendar42, PG.1451
2013-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1941h(NT) for June 5 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1429
2013-05-22HouseContinued Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 5/21/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED==
2013-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-05-08HouseContinued Public Hearing: 5/15/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307
2013-04-23HousePublic Hearing: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 ==RECESSED==
2013-04-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 35, PG.1191
2013-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1165s, New Title, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg;
2013-03-28SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1165s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote;
2013-03-28SenateSen. Woodburn Floor Amendment #2013-1123s, New Title, Regular Calendar 4Y-20N, Amendment Failed
2013-03-28SenateWithout Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1123s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted;
2013-03-28SenateChair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment
2013-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment 1085s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote;
2013-03-28SenateWithout Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1085s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted;
2013-03-28SenateChair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment
2013-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1085s, New Title, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13
2013-03-14SenateHearing: 3/20/13, Room 103, State House, 10:00 a.m. Proposed non-germane amendment to SB 99 #2013-0900s; Senate Calendar 12
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback