NH SB44 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0222; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0222; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the disposal of controlled drugs by law enforcement officers.
Title
Relative to the disposal of controlled drugs by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0222; Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Concur with House Amendments #1250h, #1600h, Motion Adopted,Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1600h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1567-1568 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1600h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1567-1568 |
2013-05-23 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1600h; House Calendar42, PG.1444 |
2013-05-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1600h for June 5 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1427 |
2013-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 5/21/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-24 | House | Public Hearing: 4/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1250h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1242 |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment #1250h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1242 |
2013-04-17 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1250h; House Calendar33, PG.1112 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1250h for April 24 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1094 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to Remove SB 44 from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |